+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 341, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6354.).
On August 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5281.).
On August 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5409.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10).
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
On February 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 20, 2018: AB 2175 AGUIAR-CURRY Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 13, 2018: Consent Calendar AB2175
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 19, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 29, 2018: AB 2175 AGUIAR-CURRY Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
May 25, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 10, 2018: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor