+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 28, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor