+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 702, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 18. Page 6586.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 6571.)
On August 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4862.).
On August 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 23. Page 5293.)
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 23).
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 29).
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended.
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and JUD.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 27, 2014: AB 2171 WIECKOWSKI Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 2
August 26, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2171 Wieckowski By Block
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
August 4, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 24, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 28, 2014: AB 2171 WIECKOWSKI Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 14
May 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 5
April 29, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
April 22, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2