+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 865, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6160.).
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 6114.)
On August 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4979.).
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21).
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4912.)
On May 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26).
On April 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On February 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
August 24, 2022: AB 2170 Grayson Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
August 23, 2022: Special Consent AB2170
- Yeas: 40
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 21, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
May 25, 2022: AB 2170 Grayson Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 2
May 11, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
April 26, 2022: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor