+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died on inactive file.
On January 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Burke.
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17).
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 2279.)
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 7.) (May 16).
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (March 26).
On March 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
On February 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On January 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 16.
On January 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
June 17, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 4
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 7
March 26, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor