+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate inactive file.
On September 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file by unanimous consent.
On August 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20).
On August 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On August 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 4).
On July 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 3. Page 4704.)
On June 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 3).
On June 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On May 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
On February 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On February 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
On February 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 20, 2020: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
August 19, 2020: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
August 4, 2020: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
June 8, 2020: AB 2167 Daly Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 15
June 3, 2020: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 1
May 7, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14