+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 895, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4939.).
On August 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4951.)
On May 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (May 19).
On April 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On March 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (March 22).
On February 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (6)
August 22, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2164 Lee et al. By Becker
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
June 28, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
June 14, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2022: AB 2164 Lee Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 9
May 19, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 22, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor