+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On March 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On February 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on C. & C. and AGRI.
On February 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
On February 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor