+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On January 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On January 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor