+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24).
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
On March 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended.
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and JUD.
On February 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
On February 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 24, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
April 17, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor