+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On April 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On February 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
On February 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.