+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 142, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 4531.).
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 13).
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 16. Page 4982.)
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19).
On April 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On March 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On February 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (5)
June 29, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2156 Wicks By Kamlager
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 4
June 8, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
May 25, 2022: AB 2156 Wicks Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 8
May 19, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
March 29, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor