+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 14. Page 6618.).
On August 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 5519.).
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 16).
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 5376.)
On May 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 16).
On May 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24).
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On February 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
On February 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 27, 2018: AB 2152 WEBER Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 3
August 21, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2152 Weber By Leyva
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 26, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2018: AB 2152 WEBER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 3
May 16, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 24, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor