+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 342, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On September 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 5. Page 3161.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3161.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 9. Page 2631.).
On August 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 26).
On August 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On July 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 11. Page 1722.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On April 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On January 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
On January 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (8)
September 10, 2021: AB 215 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 15
September 10, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB215 Chiu By Wiener
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 9
August 23, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 1, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
June 1, 2021: AB 215 Chiu Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 10
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 28, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
April 15, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor