+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 385, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6512.).
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4763.).
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5230.)
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23).
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
On March 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 27, 2014: AB 2148 MULLIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
August 22, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2148 Mullin By Lieu
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
August 4, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 25, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
May 28, 2014: AB 2148 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7