+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 60, Statutes of 2020.
On September 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 12. Page 5384.).
On August 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0.).
On August 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 31).
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 15, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 0. Page 4856.)
On June 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4747.)
On June 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (June 3).
On June 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On February 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
On February 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2020: AB 2147 Reyes Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 16
August 30, 2020: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2147 Reyes et al. By Bradford
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 10
August 13, 2020: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 31, 2020: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 15, 2020: AB 2147 Reyes Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 25
June 3, 2020: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 19, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor