+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 4).
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On February 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 4, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor