+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 269, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4377.).
On August 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5337.).
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5163.)
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14).
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B.,P. & C.P.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 7, 2014: Consent Calendar 2nd AB2143 Williams
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
June 23, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2014: AB 2143 WILLIAMS Third Reading Urgency
- Yeas: 79
May 14, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 29, 2014: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 14
April 22, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor