+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 431, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6616.).
On August 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5558.).
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27).
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5130.)
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2).
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
On February 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On February 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
On February 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 27, 2018: AB 2142 BIGELOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 21, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2142 Bigelow By Wilk
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
August 16, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 27, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
June 27, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
May 10, 2018: AB 2142 BIGELOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 5
May 2, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 18, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor