+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 897, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6474.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6444.)
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4805.).
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 5263.)
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 23).
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (March 26).
On March 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 26, 2014: AB 2141 HALL Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
August 25, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2141 Hall By Monning
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
August 4, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 24, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
June 18, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety.
- Yeas: 7
May 28, 2014: AB 2141 HALL Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
May 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 5
March 26, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2