+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On May 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 27).
On April 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
- Coauthors revised.
On April 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4359.)
- (pending re-refer to Com. on U. & E.)
On April 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & E.
On February 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
April 25, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor