+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 226, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4873.).
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5101.)
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27).
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On March 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 11, 2016: Consent Calendar 2nd AB2137 Santiago
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
June 29, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
June 1, 2016: AB 2137 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 20
April 19, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor