+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 290, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5951.).
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4373.).
On August 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17).
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5202.)
On May 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 21).
On May 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 28).
On April 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4633.)
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 11, 2014: AB 2137 QUIRK Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
August 7, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2137 Quirk By Fuller
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
June 17, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2014: AB 2137 QUIRK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
May 21, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 28, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor