+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 910, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6185.).
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 6114.)
On August 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4986.).
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On June 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13).
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.)
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.)
On May 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On April 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20).
On April 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On March 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On February 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and ED.
On February 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (9)
August 24, 2022: AB 2131 Mullin Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
August 23, 2022: Special Consent AB2131
- Yeas: 40
August 11, 2022: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
June 27, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 13, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
May 26, 2022: AB 2131 Mullin Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 3
May 19, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
April 20, 2022: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
April 5, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor