+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 365, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5823.).
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and EQ.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 5407.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On April 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on C. & C. and TRANS.
On February 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
On February 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 27, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2127 Ting By Stern
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 20, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
June 20, 2018: No Votes Recorded:
- Yeas: 7
June 19, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality]
- Yeas: 11
May 29, 2018: AB 2127 TING Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 14
April 11, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation]
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor