+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and G.O.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5406.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On February 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
On February 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 26, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
June 19, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization]
- Yeas: 7
May 29, 2018: AB 2124 RUBIO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
May 25, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor