+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On February 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
On February 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor