+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 27).
On June 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 517.)
On February 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
- Ordered to second reading.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.)
- Withdrawn from committee.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
On January 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On January 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
On January 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (2)
June 27, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 4
February 25, 2021: AB 212 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor