+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 381, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 13, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0.).
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 6114.)
On August 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4986.).
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on M. & V.A. and HUMAN S.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4924.)
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19).
On April 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On April 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on M. & V.A.
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (10)
August 31, 2022: AB 2119 Flora Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 30, 2022: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 8
August 23, 2022: Special Consent AB2119
- Yeas: 40
August 11, 2022: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 27, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
June 14, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
May 25, 2022: AB 2119 Flora Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 2
May 19, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
April 5, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor