+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On August 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 6292.).
On August 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 5230.).
On August 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29).
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4900.)
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 18).
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 12).
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 25, 2016: AB 2115 WOOD Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 8
August 22, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2115 Wood By Nguyen
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 3
June 29, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
May 23, 2016: AB 2115 WOOD Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 9
May 18, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 6
April 12, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor