+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25).
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5229.)
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 9).
On March 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 4, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 25, 2014: Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2014: AB 2110 TING Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
May 23, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 9, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7