+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1809.)
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On February 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On January 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 23.
On January 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
July 11, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
May 30, 2017: AB 211 BIGELOW Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 26, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
March 20, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10