+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (32)
On September 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 347, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 18.).
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5223.).
On August 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 15).
On June 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- 6-16-2022 hearing rescheduled by committee to 6-15-2022
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and N.R. & W.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 19. Page 4976.)
On May 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19).
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On April 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On April 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On April 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
On March 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On March 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
On February 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (9)
August 30, 2022: AB 2108 Robert Rivas Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 7
August 29, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2108 Robert Rivas et al. By Limón
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 9
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
June 15, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2022: AB 2108 Robert Rivas Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 7
May 19, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 26, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
March 22, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2