+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 276, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 5383.).
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
On August 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On August 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4725.)
On June 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2).
On March 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
On February 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On February 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
On February 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 30, 2020: AB 2104 Cristina Garcia Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
August 30, 2020: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2104 Cristina Garcia By Durazo
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 11, 2020: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
June 8, 2020: AB 2104 Cristina Garcia Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
June 2, 2020: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
March 10, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor