+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 62, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 p.m.
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4521.).
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Measure version as amended on June 25 corrected.
On June 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (June 27).
On June 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On June 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 516.)
On February 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.)
- Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
On January 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On January 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
On January 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (4)
June 29, 2022: AB 210 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
June 29, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB210 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 10
June 27, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
February 25, 2021: AB 210 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor