+ − Summaries (11)
+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (36)
On October 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 488, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 3314.).
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2782.).
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 11).
On July 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On July 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 28).
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 2063.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1853.)
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 18).
On March 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On March 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On January 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and JUD.
On December 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
On December 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 13, 2017: AB 21 Kalra Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 2
September 12, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB21 Kalra et al. By Hueso
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 3
August 21, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 11, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 28, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
June 1, 2017: AB 21 KALRA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 2
May 26, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 18, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
March 28, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor