+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On September 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 258, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5335.).
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13).
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5368.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5299.)
On April 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 20).
On February 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
On February 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 16, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2099 Gloria et al. By Beall
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 13, 2018: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2018: AB 2099 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
March 20, 2018: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor