+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 528, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 6086.).
On August 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 4406.).
On August 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 2. Page 4705.)
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9).
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (March 24).
On March 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On March 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 18, 2014: AB 2090 FONG Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
August 11, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2090 Fong By Hill
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 5
June 17, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
May 1, 2014: AB 2090 FONG Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 6
April 9, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
March 24, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor