+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 209, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 5238.).
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 12).
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 0. Page 4642.)
On April 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 10).
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
On February 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
August 9, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2090 Gonzalez Fletcher By Glazer
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 6
April 12, 2018: AB 2090 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 52
- Present/NV: 25
April 10, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor