+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 212, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5841.).
On July 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 1 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On July 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4253.).
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10).
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4849.)
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 30).
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 4, 2014: AB 2082 DAHLE Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
July 3, 2014: Consent Calendar 2nd AB2082 Dahle
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
June 10, 2014: Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 9
May 8, 2014: AB 2082 DAHLE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 6
April 30, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 7, 2014: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9