+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate inactive file.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Stern.
- From Consent Calendar.
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20).
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and EQ.
On May 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5039.)
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1).
- Coauthors revised.
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
On February 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 20, 2018: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
June 12, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 7, 2018: AB 2073 CHIU Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 4
May 1, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor