+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and GOV. & F.
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 0.)
On May 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 18).
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 20).
On April 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
On March 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
On February 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & E.
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (3)
May 26, 2022: AB 2070 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 20
May 18, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 5
April 20, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor