+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (37)
On September 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 485, Statutes of 2022.
On September 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 17.).
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 29).
On August 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Measure version as amended on August 11 corrected.
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 5055.).
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4739.)
On May 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
On May 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4938.)
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4938.)
- (pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.)
On March 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On March 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (10)
August 30, 2022: AB 2068 Haney Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 1
August 29, 2022: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 24, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2068 Haney et al. By Laird
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
August 11, 2022: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 22, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 19, 2022: AB 2068 Haney Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 6
May 11, 2022: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
April 27, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
April 27, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor