+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On April 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
- Read second time and amended.
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 21).
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and TRANS.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 21, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation.
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor