+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.)
On May 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (May 7).
On March 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Measure version as amended on March 19 corrected.
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
On February 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
May 7, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor