+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On April 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On March 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Vote
March 29, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor