+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 345, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.).
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5238.).
On August 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4978.)
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4998.)
- Motion to reconsider made by Senator McGuire.
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On August 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and TRANS.
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.)
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19).
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On April 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 7, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 6).
On March 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
On March 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On February 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and U. & E.
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (11)
August 30, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2061 Ting et al. By Becker
- Yeas: 40
August 30, 2022: AB 2061 Ting Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 23, 2022: Special Consent AB2061 Ting et al. By Becker Reconsider
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
August 23, 2022: Special Consent AB2061
- Yeas: 40
August 8, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 17
June 21, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation]
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 1
May 26, 2022: AB 2061 Ting Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 4
May 19, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
April 6, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 4
March 28, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1