+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6208.).
On August 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4455.).
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 30).
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5179.).
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23).
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 2).
On March 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 20, 2014: AB 2058 WILK Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
August 13, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2058 Wilk By DeSaulnier Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
June 10, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 2
May 27, 2014: AB 2058 WILK Third Reading Urgency
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
May 23, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 2, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 19