+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 2. Page 4998.)
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 25).
On April 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 9).
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
On February 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 3, 2018: AB 2057 SALAS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 17
April 25, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 3
April 9, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor