+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 769, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 13, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 0.).
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0.).
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 0. Page 4701.).
On April 7, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 6).
On March 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On February 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
August 31, 2022: AB 2056 Grayson Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 11
August 30, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2056 Grayson By Dodd Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
August 8, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 14, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
May 16, 2022: AB 2056 Grayson Third Reading Urgency
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 22
April 6, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
March 21, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor